+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0829)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 829 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB579ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB579S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107056D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107056D-S1
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105075D
+ − Impact Statements (6)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Janet D. Howell
Type:
Primary Sponsor