+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 717 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB578ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendment (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB578S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104439D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104439D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 14103510D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2014: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
January 21, 2014: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor