+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 643 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB578ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 989036758-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 989036758