+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 7/1/10)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB577ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 10105570D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105570D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB577H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105570D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB577S2
- Substitute by Senator McEachin agreed to 10105425D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 10105425D-S2 (McEachin)
- Committee substitute rejected 10105121D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105121D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101758D
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2010: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor