+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 374 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB576ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB576S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104471D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104471D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 14101408D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2014: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor