+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB576ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB576S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 044064104-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (33-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (33-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 044064104-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 044040104
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (33-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor