+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (28-Y 2-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989517729-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 989517729
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (28-Y 2-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor