+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0405)
On April 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 405 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB574ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor