+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102864D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2022: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
February 23, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2022: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor