+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 625 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB572ER)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 022106526-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 022106526-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 022106526-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 026528526
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2002: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor