+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
On April 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB570ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor