+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
On April 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB569ER)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 1-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 023527564
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2002: Reported from Tra. w/amd (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2002: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor