+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB567ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989375633-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989375633-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989375633-H1
- Read second time
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985308633-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985308633
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor