+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 693 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB567ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N)
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105445D-S1
- Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB567ES1
- Printed as engrossed 16105445D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105445D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103565D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2016: House amendments agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N)
February 26, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
February 12, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor