+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 713 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB567ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 1-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 14103149D