+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 486 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB566ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12103716D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB566E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 12103716D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor