+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB566ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989763633-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989763633-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989763633-H1
- Read second time
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985430633-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Saslaw agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amd. 985430633-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 985430633-ES1
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985430633-S1
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983201633
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor