+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
On April 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB565ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 023225260-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 023225260
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE (39-Y 0-N)
- Unanimous consent to introduce (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
January 11, 2002: VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor