+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
On April 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB564ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 003625230-E
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Sen. Martin agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 003625230
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor