+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0915)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB564ER2)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 1-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 915 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB564ER)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 067282820-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB564H1
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067282820-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061237134