+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 179 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB563ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 20108249D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108249D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB563H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108249D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104883D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Frank M. Ruff, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor