+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB563ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 080207400-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB563E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N)
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080207400
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor