+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (73)
On May 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0905)
On May 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 905 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation (12-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (12-Y 26-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation (11-Y 28-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (11-Y 28-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 985492753-S2
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (35-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of conf. report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (35-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (30-Y 5-N)
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 985492753
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (61-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 29-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Barry, Saslaw, Williams, Stosch, Colgan, Gartlan
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- D: Dickinson, Diamonstein, Hall, Callahan, Bloxom, Dillard
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute rejected by Senate (7-Y 33-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (7-Y 33-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mr. Tate rejected
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989760753-H1
- Passed House with substitute (73-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 23-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989760753-H1
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989760753-H1
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985428753-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985428753-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985428753-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by Trans. (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985400753
- Referred to Committee on Transportation