+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
On March 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 061138134-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB562E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061138134