+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 725 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Obenshain, Reeves, Howell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to18107315D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB562H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18107315D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106181D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Printed as engrossed 18106181D-ES1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB562ES1
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 18106181D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102977D
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2018: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor