+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
On April 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 4/14/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB560ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 986814753-S1
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 986814753-S1
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 986814753-S1
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 986768828