+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
- Reenrolled bill text (SB56ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (93-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Amended as sub. by Gov's recommendation 960074812-S1
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- Governor's substitute printed 960074812-S1
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB56ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 1
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (38-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 963211620
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1996: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor