+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (88-Y 1-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 131 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 1-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB558ER)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB558ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 982161128-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 982161128
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 1-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor