+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 3/1/03)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB557ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Howell agreed to
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read third time
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 020174540
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2002: Reported from Finance with amd (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2002: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor