+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100392D