+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 704 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB557ER)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 984255607-S1
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (32-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 2-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 984255607
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Barry, Ticer, Marsh
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Darner, Howell, DeBoer
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (4-Y 36-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 988447445-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988447445-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 988447445-H1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 983258607-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (12-Y 3-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 983258607
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (32-Y 2-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM.R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (4-Y 36-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 3-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor