+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 693 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB556ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 18108173D-S1
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Rush, Leftwich, Simon
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Mason, Spruill, Vogel
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 34-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB556H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107181D-H1
- Read third time
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107181D-H1
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102509D
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
March 8, 2018: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2018: House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 34-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
January 25, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor