+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
On April 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB556ER)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 025441540
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2002: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor