+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 808 (effective 7/1/10)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB555ER2)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB555ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB555S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104193D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10104193D-S1
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: FOIA/Conflict of Interest
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101671D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2010: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor