+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 569 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB555ER)
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB555ER)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (62-Y 36-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB555S1
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105470D-S1
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
- Recommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105470D-S1
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102507D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
January 26, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 4-N)
January 23, 2018: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor