+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
On April 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 474 (effective 1/1/97)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB554ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (93-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (18-Y 4-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp.(40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 966803819
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from Tra. (18-Y 4-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor