+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 49 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB553ER)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (26-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 989274607