+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 57 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB552ER)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022165436