+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 727 (effective 1/1/23)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB550ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
- Governor's substitute printed 22108193D-S2
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB550ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 22107429D-H2
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Appropriations committee amendments out of order due to rejection of General Laws
- Floor substitute printed 22107429D-H2 (Wiley)
- Read third time
- Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 22107080D-H1
- Substitute by Delegate Wiley agreed to 22107429D-H2
- Passed House with substitute (91-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB550H2
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22107080D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
- Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB550S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22104655D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 22104655D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102233D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N)
March 7, 2022: House substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
March 3, 2022: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N)
February 28, 2022: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
February 14, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
February 14, 2022: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
February 10, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
February 2, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor