+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 711 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB549ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 14103229D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB549E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 3-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 14103229D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
January 20, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
January 20, 2014: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor