+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/16)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB549ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 16105559D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N 2-A)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105559D-H1
- Floor substitute printed 16105756D-H2 (Cole)
- Read third time
- Substitute by Delegate Cole rejected 16105756D-H2
- VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N 2-A)
- Amendments by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB549H1
- Passed House with substitute (72-Y 26-N 2-A)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105559D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 8-N 2-A)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 16105216D-S2 (Obenshain)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 16105117D-S1
- Substitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 16105216D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB549S2
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 16105117D-S1
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103808D