+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
On April 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB548ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute w/amd. waived
- House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (33-Y 6-N)
- Rec. of House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (30-Y 10-N)
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with sub. with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd. 004486504-EH1
- Amendment by Del. Tata agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 004486504-H1
- Read third time
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 004486504-H1
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 001907504-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 001907504-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (24-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (24-Y 12-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 001907504-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (9-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer. by E.H. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 003934206
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (33-Y 6-N)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (30-Y 10-N)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2000: Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (24-Y 12-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (9-Y 6-N)
February 3, 2000: Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer. by E.H. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor