+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 863 (effective 7/1/94)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (96-Y 1-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 1-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB547ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 1-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor