+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB545ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Amendments by Del. Diamonstein agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (88-Y 8-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7193753 (SB545S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor