+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB543ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989293666-E
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 989293666
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor