+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 109 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB542ER)
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 005779440
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor