+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 806 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB542ER)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 35-N)
- Passed House (57-Y 35-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (37-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB542S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062062824-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 062062824-S1
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062001824
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 35-N)
March 6, 2006: Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 3-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2006: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor