+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB542ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB542S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103909D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14103909D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 14103176D
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor