+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB540ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 14103078D
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor