+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 413 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB538ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 082592616-H1 (Marshall, R. G. )
- Read third time
- Speaker ruled floor substitute by Delegate Marshall, R.G. not germane
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 081404804-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB538E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081404804
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor